Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BRANKSOME ST. CLEMENT, PARKSTONE
Charity number: 1131692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Fisher | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA MAY FISHER | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Laird | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY ELIZABETH ROBINSON | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER NORMAN ALLEN | Trustee | 10 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lerys William Campbell Mr | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Neil Stanton | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret West | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER LEONARD JERROM | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Wilkins | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARY JOYCE LORY | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Standley Underhill | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
ISOBEL JOEENE HEATON | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
COLIN CRABB | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Victor Wilkins | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adeeta Knight | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MRS MO WILLIS REV | Trustee | 28 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
REV LYNN JOAN BOWERMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.