Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, TOOTING GRAVENEY

Charity number: 1129352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £254.41k £272.50k £387.49k £304.82k £312.52k
Total expenditure £273.36k £407.71k £299.89k £286.58k £321.67k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £12.89k £13.77k £985 £5.32k