Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, TOOTING GRAVENEY
Charity number: 1129352

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Grace Waterhouse | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Mair Harries | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Schofield | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Reeta George Laxman | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Timothy William Dennis | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Houghton | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Williams | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Paterson | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lawal Afuwape | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wakako Hirose | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Hansen | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Julie Smith | Trustee | 28 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peter Wilson | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Catherine Brailsford Piper | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MARK LAUGHARNE THOMAS | Trustee | 30 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY GEORGIA WILSON | Trustee | 12 July 2011 |
|
|||||
DAVID ROBERT CHAMBERLAIN | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr JAMES DAVID RALPH BUCHANAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GARTH ALAN WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.