REIGATE PARK UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1130103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £163.85k £161.71k £150.46k £259.48k £151.97k
Total expenditure £148.27k £175.25k £151.92k £163.62k £157.37k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £13.25k £0 N/A N/A