Trustees LIDGETT PARK METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1129423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
28 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Tanya Marie Short | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Janet Sanders | Trustee | 20 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOAN ROBERTS | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Patricia Mary Brooke | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Nolan | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Farrar | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Illingworth | Trustee | 26 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janice Green | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Gary Albiges | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chris Tear | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Heather Fry | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Wittrick | Trustee | 06 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Firth | Trustee | 19 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA BELSHAM | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Faint | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Frances Benson | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Mary Albiges | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ASHTON | Trustee | 03 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE BARTON | Trustee | 03 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET EDNA LEE | Trustee | 30 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET FARRAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER JOHN BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA HOLMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN WITTRICK BSc, FCMA | Trustee |
|
||||||
JENNIFER DIANE DALTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
Graham Eric Saunders | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.