EASTHAMPSTEAD BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1129467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £364.82k £362.50k £321.58k £360.70k £271.93k
Total expenditure £381.16k £352.35k £339.51k £396.62k £230.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A