THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARYLEBONE WITH HOLY TRINITY ST MARYLEBONE

Charity number: 1129435
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 December 2020 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 December 2020 59 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 16 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 03 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 14 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 14 September 2016 On time Download