THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARYLEBONE WITH HOLY TRINITY ST MARYLEBONE

Charity number: 1129435
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £782.24k £1.03m £1.21m £1.74m £1.26m
Total expenditure £867.35k £837.35k £1.27m £1.41m £1.37m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £21.00k £0 £26.00k N/A £355.70k
Income - Donations and legacies £274.08k £460.42k £323.52k £840.23k £603.06k
Income - Other trading activities £351.79k £426.68k £653.09k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £748.10k £497.32k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £119.59k £147.87k £151.60k £156.15k £156.55k
Income - Other £36.79k £0 £77.87k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £150.00k £91.72k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £742.37k £833.26k £1.27m £1.41m £1.37m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £4.51k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £4.20k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0