Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SONNING

Charity number: 1130763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £624.11k £512.67k £918.71k £326.88k £324.51k
Total expenditure £311.88k £326.46k £434.47k £359.57k £288.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £12.25k
Income - Donations and legacies £425.78k £419.40k £263.94k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £54.97k £38.90k £35.31k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £143.37k £7.11k £7.47k N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £47.26k £612.00k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £97.00k £200 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £274.62k £325.07k £432.95k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £37.27k £1.40k £1.53k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £1.54k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £10.50k £9.66k £12.31k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £22.08k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A