Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SONNING

Charity number: 1130763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev JAMIE ALEXANDER FRANKLYN TAYLOR Chair
ROBERT PALMER'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
HILARY JANE RENNIE Trustee 11 July 2021
None on record
INDRA TATJANA BIDDULPH Trustee 11 July 2021
None on record
Helen Rosemary Craig Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
Thomas James Dowdeswell Jeffery Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Christopher Timothy West Trustee 11 September 2018
None on record
Elizabeth Jane Nelson Trustee 22 May 2018
FRIENDS OF ST ANDREW'S CHURCH, SONNING
Received: On time
BULL INN ECCLESIASTICAL TRUST
Received: On time
JENNIFER SAWYER Trustee 28 April 2018
None on record
Rev KATIE LEANNE WAKEMAN-TOOGOOD Trustee 18 September 2017
None on record
ALISON SMYLY Trustee 27 April 2017
None on record
SIMON JOHN DARVALL Trustee 27 April 2016
None on record
SUSAN JANET PETERS Trustee 27 April 2016
None on record
SANDRA IRENE GRIST Trustee 27 April 2016
None on record
RODERICK JOHN SYMES Trustee 27 July 2014
None on record
Stuart David Bowman Trustee 09 April 2014
None on record
Rachel Louise Argent Trustee 09 April 2014
None on record
MOLLY JEANETTE WOODLEY Trustee
None on record
RICHARD MARTIN MOORE Trustee
None on record
ROBERT JAMES PETERS Trustee
None on record