Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, GREAT BERKHAMSTED
Charity number: 1130108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Stuart Owen | Chair | 12 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Sarah Elder | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Chatterton | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Cooke | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Patricia Homes | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Thomas Fradgley | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Joseph Roberts | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR ASTRID BIDDLE | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYNNE CHARMAN | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
REV John Russell | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Elliott | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
TIM HENNESSEY | Trustee | 06 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARK GREGO | Trustee | 02 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER PAUL GREEN | Trustee |
|
||||||
RICHARD DAVID HACKWORTH | Trustee |
|
||||||
JULIAN DAVID DAWSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.