Accounts and annual returns PALM

Charity number: 1132991
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 February 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 June 2021 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 February 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required