WOODLANDS FIELD LIMITED

Charity number: 1130706
Charity reporting is overdue by 397 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £465.56k £176.28k £120.35k £87.87k £86.55k
Total expenditure £195.78k £175.22k £128.00k £94.77k £88.68k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £32.00k £32.00k £22.56k £29.19k