Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GEORGE, BENENDEN
Charity number: 1132696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DAVID JAMES COMMANDER | Chair | 14 October 2013 |
|
|||||
Sally-Ann Barbara Marks | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Winifred Hazel Strouts | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Harmsworth | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Anthony Stubbings | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|||||
CATHERINE JANE PRESGRAVE | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Elizabeth Fisher | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ylva Helena Blid-Mackenzie MA | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANE PATRICIA DAVIES | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BARNES | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
|||||
David Collard | Trustee | 11 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES EDWARD TROLLOPE BSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIA ROSE COLLARD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.