Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER REDCAR
Charity number: 1130713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carole Seymour | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Steele | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Lupton | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Steele | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Veitch | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Westcough | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Brian Harvey | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Harvey | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Mary Fitzpatrick | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Fox | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gary David Hagen | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Andrew Graham | Trustee | 30 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE GRAHAM | Trustee | 19 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANNE HAGEN | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAPHNE JILL WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER FRANCIS BOWERS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.