BEIS BRUCHA LTD

Charity number: 1131109
Charity reporting is up to date (60 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 29 April 2021 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 29 April 2021 60 days late Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 31 March 2020 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 31 March 2020 31 days late Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 28 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 28 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 28 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 28 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 27 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 27 February 2017 On time Download