Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF FAWKHAM AND HARTLEY
Charity number: 1130791
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FREDERICK GEORGE GRAINGER | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Kneller | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev elizabeth mary robertson | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise April Chick-Smith | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
CAROL LESLEY STONE | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
MALCOLM JAMES HARRIS | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lucie Mary Sleeman | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
john waller | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN BENNETT | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
amanda yvonne malas | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES MARY KINNEAR | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
gillian alice ann cramp | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|||||
carol linda ballard | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Hoad | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.