THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL, CHELTENHAM

Charity number: 1130330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN MARTIN RUSSELL Trustee 18 April 2018
RAPHA MEDICA PROJECT Received: On time
AMANDA BURTON Trustee 22 July 2021 None on record
Louise CONSTANT-FORD Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record
Jennifer Fellows Trustee 16 July 2018 None on record
BENJAMIN RUSSELL BOOTH Trustee 12 March 2017
THE ST PAUL'S OLD SCHOOL TRUST (CHELTENHAM) Received: On time
ST PAUL'S MISSION HALL Received: On time
David Richard CHATFIELD Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record
Jonathan Mark Platt Trustee 24 April 2019
THE ST PAUL'S OLD SCHOOL TRUST (CHELTENHAM) Received: On time
ST PAUL'S MISSION HALL Received: On time
Rev ROGER JAMES WIDDECOMBE Chair 01 September 2006
ST PAUL'S MISSION HALL Received: On time
Andrew Jenkins Trustee 24 April 2019 None on record
NEIL MICHAEL DENNISS Trustee 30 April 2014 None on record
CYRIL MEREDITH Trustee 15 September 2007
RAPHA MEDICA PROJECT Received: On time
Mark Jonathon Constance Trustee 18 April 2018 None on record
Sarah Ellen Hillman Trustee 24 April 2019 None on record
MARK EDWARD HIRST Trustee 15 April 2015 None on record