AL ARQAM

Charity number: 1133157
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £174.18k £193.35k £190.05k £185.19k £203.81k
Total expenditure £143.77k £181.70k £208.11k £184.44k £209.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A