THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW'S, CHORLEYWOOD

Charity number: 1130419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £670.40k £591.70k £566.94k £557.44k £605.34k
Total expenditure £671.23k £639.32k £571.19k £605.94k £681.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £601.89k £546.04k £514.72k £508.66k £541.24k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £6.14k £6.92k £6.53k £13.78k
Income - Charitable activities £60.76k £38.30k £44.00k £41.30k £49.72k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £540 £471 £307 £724 £607
Income - Other £7.21k £739 £1.00k £230 £0
Income - Legacies £10.00k £0 £6.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £665.07k £639.32k £571.19k £605.94k £681.66k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.16k £165.10k £4.35k £4.49k £4.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £187.72k £191.59k £181.65k £193.91k £192.43k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0