ASHFORD BAPTIST CHURCH, KENT

Charity number: 1130593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £178.56k £175.36k £182.75k £216.36k £173.85k
Total expenditure £178.99k £157.07k £187.70k £197.94k £177.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A