VERA KAYE ROLLIT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 500391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 26 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 25 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 02 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 02 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 05 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required