Financial history OUR SANSAR LIMITED

Charity number: 1132124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £132.98k £109.02k £100.31k £128.65k £131.27k
Total expenditure £155.39k £113.11k £117.12k £115.48k £119.04k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A