Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST WILFRID, COWPLAIN
Charity number: 1130601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sara Anne Bolton | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Watson | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Farmer | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yolanda Louise Cawdeary | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine King | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek Colin Baker | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Anne Couper | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maria Josephine McGannan | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Jeanne Hoey | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Derek Kelvin Johnston | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Edward Day | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colin Mason | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jo Mead | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Denise Carole Williams | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Passingham | Trustee | 10 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE HEATHER STRUTT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.