Accounts and annual returns HAYDON BRIDGE AND HAYDON PARISH DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1135248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required