Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE BARNSBURY TEAM MINISTRY
Charity number: 1130552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev SARAH CAROLINE TITLEY | Chair | 27 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Idina Mary Dunmore | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Wood | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAMES INGLIS DUNNETT | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Suzanne Ruth Outram Procter | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Sir Philip McDougall Rutnam KCB | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Hector Hinojosa | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chanel Georgio | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Lis Howell | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simona Valeriani | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Codling | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Pamela O'Donnell | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen Codling | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN PARKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR ROLAND JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.