THE PAROCHIAL COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETERS,TUNBRIDGE WELLS

Charity number: 1131548
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter John Fromow Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
Sally Marie Poland Trustee 01 January 2014 None on record
MR BILL LANE Trustee None on record
Mary Sturgeon Trustee 03 April 2016 None on record
MICHAEL SUMPTER Trustee None on record
ANTHONY JOHN BURGESS Trustee 03 April 2016 None on record
Lindsey Sumpter Trustee 03 April 2016 None on record
KEITH DOUGLAS WATERS Trustee None on record
Rachel Harriet Fromow Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
Philip Ian Spencer Peddar Trustee 31 August 2017
CAMP XL Received: On time
Richard Allan Akehurst Trustee 01 January 2014 None on record
Michele Burgess Trustee 31 March 2014 None on record
Rev MICHAEL PHILIP WARREN Chair
THE ROCHESTER GOOD STEWARDS TRUST Received: 6 days late
BIBLICAL COUNSELLING UK Received: On time