YOUTH ABOUT

Charity number: 1132046
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 759 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 759 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1124 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1124 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 14 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 29 April 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required