Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NANTWICH
Charity number: 1130903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mark Hart | Chair | 14 March 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Philip Ian Boxhall | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Keith Arnold Billing | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Janet Christine Thompson | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Linda Maudette Lewis | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Elizabeth Jane Roberts | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Margaret Wendy Beastall | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Jane Teresa Knight | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Elizabeth Alison Phillips | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Penelope Jane Smith | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Jonathan Michael Howard Layfield | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rev Vanessa Denise Layfield | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Ernest Arthur Charlton | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Mary Alison Harris | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Dr Janette Christine Allotey RM,MA,PhD | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
PAUL SIMON O'BRIEN | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
CHRIS HARRIS | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Hilda Ann Patricia Stalker | Trustee | 17 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
BELINDA JOYCE COGHLAN | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Bryan Coghlan | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||
Dr Gillian Ann Appleton | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||
MR STEVE LOCKETT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.