THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST MARY & ST CUTHBERT PARISH CHURCH, CHESTER-LE-STREET

Charity number: 1130847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 November 2019 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 November 2019 20 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 02 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 02 October 2017 On time Download