OWEN STREET COMMUNITY ARTS CENTRE

Charity number: 1134940
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 31 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 11 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 11 August 2020 316 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 04 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 03 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required