Financial history THEATRE ABSOLUTE

Charity number: 1134077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £72.26k £231.56k £76.46k £158.53k £275.93k
Total expenditure £70.14k £226.40k £75.52k £93.53k £157.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A