Financial history PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL, CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1132965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £319.55k £282.14k £360.05k £341.90k £232.66k
Total expenditure £246.98k £281.96k £301.64k £320.31k £243.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.89k £4.03k £2.91k £400 £15.37k