Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST HELEN, BISHOPSGATE

Charity number: 1131501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £4.10m £3.88m £4.00m £3.39m £4.79m
Total expenditure £3.63m £4.06m £3.81m £3.32m £3.62m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £60.30k £598
Income - Donations and legacies £3.20m £3.23m £3.37m £3.09m £4.32m
Income - Other trading activities £76.38k £63.05k £62.96k £119.09k £115.05k
Income - Charitable activities £512.07k £481.71k £504.59k £129.71k £275.19k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.21k £9.57k £13.34k £8.33k £5.79k
Income - Other £309.20k £94.49k £44.06k £38.67k £72.01k
Income - Legacies £13.40k £10.00k £0 £263 £701.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.63m £4.06m £3.81m £3.32m £3.62m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £9.96k £10.50k £10.29k £13.49k £14.61k
Expenditure - Grants institution £290.19k £308.93k £117.35k £125.81k £97.33k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0