Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST HELEN, BISHOPSGATE

Charity number: 1131501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

47 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REVD W T TAYLOR Chair
ST ANTHOLIN'S LECTURESHIP CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ST PETER-UPON-CORNHILL TRUST
Received: On time
THE DICK LUCAS TRUST
Received: On time
Wendy Natukunda Kasenene Trustee 14 June 2022
None on record
Lachlan Thomas Rurlander Trustee 25 April 2022
None on record
Rachel Joy Steeden Trustee 25 April 2022
None on record
Aggie Him Yau Yu Trustee 25 April 2022
None on record
Anna Keziah Robson Trustee 25 April 2022
None on record
Rev Philip Owen Hudson Trustee 07 July 2021
None on record
The Rev'd Andrew Peter Balch Trustee 07 July 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL CORNHILL
Received: On time
Thomas Richard James Trustee 26 April 2021
None on record
BRIAN WILLIAM O'DONOGHUE Trustee 19 October 2020
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
RENEW CONFERENCE
Received: 1 day late
GOSPEL PARTNERS TRUST
Received: On time
ELTHAM COLLEGE
Received: On time
THE GREAT ST HELEN'S TRUST
Received: On time
JAMES DAVID ATHOLE LAING Trustee 19 October 2020
ACL MISSION TRUST
Received: On time
WEST LONDON MISSION TRUST
Received: On time
Timothy Peter Benjamin Shelley Trustee 19 October 2020
None on record
Ian Maurice Bright Trustee 19 October 2020
None on record
Ranti Williams Trustee 02 July 2020
None on record
Michael Burden Trustee 02 July 2020
None on record
Glenn Sommerville Trustee 02 July 2020
None on record
Anna Lamb Trustee 02 July 2020
None on record
Luke Cornelius Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Richard de Villiers Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Sian Hogan Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Christopher Longden Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Philipp Hagenbuch Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Jeffrey Xiao Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Caroline Hardwick Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Merley Okine Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Donald Nartey Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Dr Sam Trowbridge Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
CHARLES KASENENE Trustee 24 April 2017
None on record
Robert Keep Trustee 24 April 2017
None on record
Mike Thorpe Trustee 25 April 2016
None on record
JAMES HOUGHTON Trustee 19 October 2012
None on record
LUKE WILLIAM SWATMAN Trustee 19 October 2012
None on record
DR YIH-CHOUNG TEH Trustee 16 June 2011
None on record
SARAH SAMANTHA TOO Trustee 16 June 2011
INSURANCE ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Rev Dr ANEIRIN GLYN Trustee 22 March 2011
None on record
RICHARD PETER TETT Trustee 22 March 2011
THE JESUS COLLEGE BOAT CLUB TRUST
Received: On time
THE ST NICHOLAS COLE ABBEY CENTRE FOR WORKPLACE MINISTRY LIMITED
Received: On time
STEPHEN MICHAEL MCGOWAN Trustee 21 March 2011
None on record
Roderick Gavin Adam ANDERSON Trustee
None on record
ANDREW WALES QC Trustee
None on record
JEREMY ANDERSON CBE Trustee
THE PRODUCTIVITY GROUP
Received: On time
RICHARD ANDREWS Trustee
None on record
Kyla Lynne Malcolm Trustee
GOSPEL PARTNERS TRUST
Received: On time
SARAH ROSEMARY ANN FINCH Trustee
GLOBAL FELLOWSHIP OF CONFESSING ANGLICANS
Received: On time
WYCLIFFE HALL
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Simon Congdon Trustee
THE ST PETER-UPON-CORNHILL TRUST
Received: On time
PAUL SIMPKIN Trustee
BENENDEN SCHOOL (KENT) LIMITED
Received: 13 days late
DR GEOFFREY HAIRE Trustee
None on record
ANDREW ROSS Trustee
None on record