ST BARNABAS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1131877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £148.01k £149.82k £163.52k £190.78k £192.88k
Total expenditure £136.60k £142.46k £149.40k £167.59k £230.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £108.70k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A