THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST DENYS, LISVANE

Charity number: 1131310
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £154.59k £146.63k £133.05k £263.51k £152.74k
Total expenditure £129.04k £124.84k £143.00k £150.38k £156.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A