THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST DENYS, LISVANE

Charity number: 1131310

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Melanie Falleyn Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Janet Heather Marsden Trustee 03 April 2017 None on record
John Lancaster Trustee 19 April 2021 None on record
Dr DUNCAN SHADWELL Trustee None on record
Michael John Inkpen Trustee 31 October 2013 None on record
Rev James Griffiths Chair 16 July 2019 None on record
Martyn Ridge Trustee None on record
Dr John Willis Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
John Martin Steward Trustee 13 April 2015 None on record
Mererid Stone Trustee 07 April 2014 None on record
Stephen Brunker Trustee 31 October 2013 None on record
Andrew James Keogh Trustee 07 April 2014 None on record
Karen Lea Neill Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record