Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DEDHAM

Charity number: 1130860
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter George Wilson Chair 23 April 2017
THE LITTLEGARTH COTTAGES TRUST
Overdue by 283 days
HEWITT MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
THE ASSEMBLY ROOMS TRUST, DEDHAM
Received: On time
THE DEDHAM ECCLESIASTICAL LECTURESHIP
Received: On time
Akshay John Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Helen Jane Sims Trustee 26 April 2021
None on record
RICHARD ANDREW HOPKINS Trustee 27 September 2020
THE DEDHAM ECCLESIASTICAL LECTURESHIP
Received: On time
Sharon Sarson Trustee 27 September 2020
THE DEDHAM ECCLESIASTICAL LECTURESHIP
Received: On time
Linda Denise Redlich Trustee 27 September 2020
FRIENDS OF DEDHAM PARISH CHURCH
Received: On time
Paul Robert Brebner Trustee 27 September 2020
None on record
Elizabeth Ann Reed Trustee 27 September 2020
None on record
JOHN REED Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
Lynne AL SAD Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
VEE DRUITT Trustee 23 April 2017
HEWITT MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
THE DEDHAM ECCLESIASTICAL LECTURESHIP
Received: On time
GABRIEL ELIZABETH MAUD WATSON Trustee 31 January 2015
None on record