THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, HAUGHTON GREEN

Charity number: 1131528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 December 2019 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 December 2019 51 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 20 December 2016 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 22 December 2016 52 days late Download