RAF HONINGTON SERGEANTS' MESS

Charity number: 1131113
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 17 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 17 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 20 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 20 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 05 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 23 May 2018 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 May 2018 53 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 23 May 2018 418 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 May 2018 418 days late Download