Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHANDLER'S FORD

Charity number: 1131152
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £340.82k £333.35k £319.55k £285.67k £310.23k
Total expenditure £338.06k £325.05k £325.76k £301.49k £298.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £2.74k