SCUNTHORPE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1131049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/12/2020
Total gross income £177.69k £160.09k £165.09k £166.91k £181.00k
Total expenditure £184.73k £185.60k £157.64k £169.03k £130.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A