THE BLACK AND MINORITY ETHNIC YOUNG PEOPLES' PROJECT

Charity number: 1132435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 April 2019 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 April 2019 70 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 26 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 17 March 2017 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 17 March 2017 45 days late Download