THE BLACK AND MINORITY ETHNIC YOUNG PEOPLES' PROJECT

Charity number: 1132435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £56.04k £79.19k £41.83k £43.72k £39.86k
Total expenditure £90.32k £33.37k £38.40k £39.70k £49.88k
Income from government contracts £15.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £18.00k £23.00k £19.00k N/A N/A