Dogfen lywodraethu Kings Cliffe Community Hive
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JULY 2009 AS AMENDED ON 01 MAR 2021 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01 NOV 2021 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16 NOV 2021 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21 FEB 2022 as amended on 02 May 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ANYONE UNDER THE AGE OF 18 YEARS OLD THROUGH THEIR LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES TO HELP THEM ACHIEVE THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL WELLBEING SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.