Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST MARY, STOWMARKET

Charity number: 1132857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 July 2017 On time Download Open in new window