Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE AND CHRIST CHURCH, CHELSEA
Charity number: 1133092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV'D Brian LEATHARD | Chair | 06 October 2006 |
|
|||||||||
Dr BARBARA SCHWEPCKE | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Jonathan Price | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Louisa Frances Swee Lin Price | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Brenda Hagerty | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Jacqueline Poysden | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Samuel Hole | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Elizabeth Claire Brutus | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Alexander Banbury | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Elizabeth Watson-Steele | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Aidus Mc Veigh | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Charles Combe | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
RICHARD JORDAN | Trustee | 12 October 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
TIMOTHY MCKEAN | Trustee | 12 October 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
NICOLA ELLARD | Trustee | 12 October 2012 |
|
|||||||||
John Francis Ellard | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.