Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TILEHURST, ST MICHAEL
Charity number: 1131421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Amy Susanna Sykes | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Lesley Hopkins | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Douglas Hamilton | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Janet Mary Fisher | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David John Stevens | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Denise Marsh | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Fagg | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Firth | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Shirley-Quirk | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
DUNSTAN GILES WINTER | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Jack Leslie Smee | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Hilary Fellows Easteal | Trustee | 11 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Joan White | Trustee | 11 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOAN CROSSMAN | Trustee | 11 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Tracy Jane Watkins | Trustee | 03 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Joan MacDonald | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Eloise Elvey | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Bardwell | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Reverend Doctor Elizabeth Clare Ratcliffe | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Sarah Anne Cairns | Trustee | 18 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Woodlock | Trustee | 18 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jane Sarah Masson | Trustee | 18 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.