THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT BURSTEAD

Charity number: 1132012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 05 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 28 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 28 April 2016 On time Download